Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Marie-Joseph Delamaire

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1848BornParis
25 May 187224.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190153.2SelectedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
18 Apr 190153.2ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
25 Jul 190153.5Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
3 Sep 190658.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cambrai, France
3 Sep 190658.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methymna
7 Feb 191365.0SucceededArchbishop of Cambrai, France
21 Jul 191365.5DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Joseph Delamaire:
Archbishop François-Marie-Joseph Delamaire (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013