Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal d’Ailly

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350²BornCompiègne
2 Apr 139545.2AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
15 Nov 139545.8AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
6 Jun 141161.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
6 Jun 141161.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 141262.9AppointedAdministrator of Limoges, France
7 Aug 141363.5AppointedAdministrator of Orange, France
1418²68.0ResignedAdministrator of Orange, France
8 Aug 1420³70.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Ailly:
Pierre Cardinal d’Ailly (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

  • a cardinal for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015