Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Théodore de Brias

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1631BornMarienbourg, Bulgaria
2 Mar 166432.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 167240.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
29 May 167240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
17 Jun 167543.5AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
28 Oct 167644.9InstalledArchbishop of Cambrai, France
16 Nov 169462.9DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Théodore de Brias:
Archbishop Jacques-Théodore de Brias (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104, and Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015