Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore-Germain Allart, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornSezanne
1637¹20.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1642¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 May 168164.4SelectedBishop of Vence, France
8 Jun 168265.4ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
12 Jul 168265.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
25 Sep 168265.7InstalledBishop of Vence, France
13 Dec 168568.9DiedBishop of Vence, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodore-Germain Allart:
Bishop Théodore-Germain Allart O.F.M. (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Vence

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015