Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Étienne Marie Joseph Ghislaine Gérard Motte, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai

Titular Bishop of Sufes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1913BornMouvaux, France
26 Jul 193825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Mar 196855.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
16 Mar 196855.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
19 May 196855.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
9 May 198572.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
19 Jan 200187.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Étienne Marie Joseph Ghislaine Gérard Motte:
Bishop Jean-François Étienne Marie Joseph Ghislaine Gérard Motte O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015