Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gauthier Pierre Georges Antoine Dubois, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Bishop of Atenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1906BornTonnerre, France
27 Jul 193024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Nov 197468.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
15 Nov 197468.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Atenia
2 Mar 197568.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atenia
29 May 198983.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Gauthier Pierre Georges Antoine Dubois:
Bishop Gauthier Pierre Georges Antoine Dubois O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013