Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de Croy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

Administrator of Toledo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1498²BornNetherlands
Aug 1516³18.6AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
1 Apr 151719.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 151719.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
31 Dec 151720.0AppointedAdministrator of Toledo, Spain
17 Aug 151921.6ResignedBishop of Cambrai, France
6 Jan 152123.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Croy:
Cardinal Guillaume de Croy (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai

  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Apr 1517
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 23, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013