Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal Dubois

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1656BornBrive la Gaillarde
25 Feb 172063.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Mar 172063.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 172063.6AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
9 Jun 172063.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
16 Jul 172164.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Aug 172366.9DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Dubois:
Guillaume Cardinal Dubois (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 3.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jul 1721
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015