Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Emmanuel Cardinal de la Trémoille

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1659BornThouars
17 May 170646.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170646.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
27 Jan 171656.5SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
8 Jun 171656.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
11 May 171858.8AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
30 May 171959.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
10 Jan 172060.5DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Emmanuel de la Trémoille:
Joseph-Emmanuel Cardinal de la Trémoille (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for .6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 111, and Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015