Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter de Corte

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491¹Born
10 Mar 156170.1AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
26 Dec 156170.9Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
8 Feb 156271.1InstalledBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
16 Oct 156776.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pieter de Corte
Bishop Pieter de Corte (born 1491, died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrugge, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained BishopS. Rombaut, Malines, Archdiocese of Mechelen
Death PlaceBruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018