Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Marie Cardinal Tarugi, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1525BornMontepulciano
156539.4ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
1571¹45.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
9 Dec 159267.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
22 Dec 159267.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
5 Jun 159670.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 159671.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
15 Sep 159772.1AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
17 Jun 160276.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
1606¹80.4ResignedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
11 Jun 160882.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Tarugi:
Cardinal François-Marie Tarugi C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 127, and Page 297
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013