Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Beretti (Valentico), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1506Born
6 Mar 156659.2AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
26 Apr 156659.4Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
7 Mar 157265.2DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Adriano Beretti (Valentico)
Bishop Adriano Beretti (Valentico) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValentico, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,810
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018