Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton von Knebel von Katzenellenbogen

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1646Born
9 Feb 170558.2SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Apr 170558.4ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
1 Jun 170558.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 170659.5Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Apr 172578.4DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton von Knebel von Katzenellenbogen
Bishop Johann Anton von Knebel von Katzenellenbogen (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,316
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Aug 2020

Quantcast