Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifatius (Giovanni Giuseppe) Cecchotti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1697Born
11 Feb 172022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
18 Feb 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Nov 174043.7SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
3 Jul 174144.3ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
10 Sep 174144.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 May 176568.1DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

MicroData Summary for Bonifatius (Giovanni Giuseppe) Cecchotti
Bishop Bonifatius (Giovanni Giuseppe) Cecchotti O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pedena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018