Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Fogarasy

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1800Born
12 Oct 182323.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 182323.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 186564.3SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
27 Mar 186564.5ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
7 May 186564.6Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
23 Mar 188281.5DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

MicroData Summary for Mihály Fogarasy (VIAF: 3536487)
Bishop Mihály Fogarasy (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyergyószentmiklós, Diocese of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa, Hungary

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 561
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017