Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Németh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Csanád

Titular Bishop of Isauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1831BornSzeged
10 Aug 185322.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 185423.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 187442.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Csanád, Hungary
16 Jan 187442.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
19 Apr 187443.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
1920¹88.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Németh:
Bishop József Németh (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Csanád

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013