Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lönhart

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1819BornNagyág
26 Jul 184424.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Jul 184424.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 188161.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
5 Apr 188161.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
5 Jun 188161.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
30 Mar 188262.5SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
3 Jul 188262.8ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
28 Jun 189777.7DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lönhart:
Bishop Francesco Lönhart (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 291, and Page 561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013