Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konštantín Schuster

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1817BornSzakolcza, Slovakia
183113.4ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
25 Jul 184023.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
2 Aug 184023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
1 Jul 185739.9IncardinatedPriest
6 May 187759.8SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
25 Jun 187759.9ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
23 Sep 187760.1Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
2 Oct 187760.2InstalledBishop of Košice, Slovakia
13 Nov 188669.3SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
17 Mar 188769.6ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
23 Jul 189982.0DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Konštantín Schuster:
Bishop Konštantín Schuster (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 189, and Page 578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013