Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lichtensteiger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1825BornKalocsa
31 Jul 184722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kalocsa, Hungary
5 Jul 184823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
13 May 188156.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
13 May 188156.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
5 Jun 188156.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
17 Sep 190176.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lichtensteiger:
Bishop Francesco Lichtensteiger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013