Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrej (André) Szabó

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1738³BornAlsónyék
1 Mar 176022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
14 Feb 176123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
23 Mar 180466.2SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
20 Aug 180466.6ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
18 Nov 180466.9Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
18 Dec 180466.9InstalledBishop of Košice, Slovakia
28 Sep 181981.7DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrej (André) Szabó:
Bishop Andrej (André) Szabó (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013