Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Baptist Jesich

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1746BornNovi
27 Aug 176922.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Nov 176923.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 178841.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
15 Dec 178842.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
15 Dec 178842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
22 Feb 178942.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
13 Sep 178942.8SucceededBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
6 May 183386.5DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Joannes Baptist Jesich
Bishop Joannes Baptist Jesich (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319, and Page 372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016