Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihael Napotnik

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1850Born
25 Jul 187524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
27 Sep 188939.0AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
27 Oct 188939.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
28 Mar 192271.5DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Mihael Napotnik (VIAF: 54953699)
Bishop Mihael Napotnik (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepanje, Diocese of Lavant
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1889, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017