Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Alois Buchmayer

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1770³BornWaidhofen
8 Jul 179222.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
6 Apr 183564.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 Apr 183564.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
24 May 183565.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
28 Dec 184272.6SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
30 Jan 184372.6ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
30 Apr 184372.9InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
2 Sep 185181.2DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Alois Buchmayer:
Bishop Anton Alois Buchmayer (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 211, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013