Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Pollitzer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Telmissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1786³BornOblaß
21 Sep 180923.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sankt Pölten, Austria
22 Sep 180923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
19 Jun 184357.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
19 Jun 184357.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
23 Jul 184357.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
12 Sep 185064.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Pollitzer
Bishop Mathias Pollitzer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016