Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Johann Wagner

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1788BornLinz
25 Aug 181123.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Linz, Austria
1 Sep 181123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
27 Apr 183344.7AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
2 May 183344.7SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
29 Jul 183345.0ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
8 Sep 183345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
16 Nov 183547.3SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
1 Feb 183647.5ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
24 Apr 183647.7InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
23 Oct 184254.2DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Michael Johann Wagner:
Bishop Michael Johann Wagner (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 108, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013