Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Tomasz Wincenty de Korczyński

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1784³BornTarnów
27 Dec 180723.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jan 180823.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 183449.2SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Jun 183449.5ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Aug 183449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
8 Oct 183954.8DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michał Tomasz Wincenty de Korczyński (VIAF: 101654675)
Bishop Michał Tomasz Wincenty de Korczyński (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016