Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Simon Melchior de Petris

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1756Born
18 Sep 177922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Apr 181255.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seckau, Austria
1 Aug 182366.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Seckau, Austria
6 Sep 183275.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Simon Melchior de Petris
Father Simon Melchior de Petris (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnsberg

  • a priest for 52.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast