Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenzel Wilhelm von Hofkirchen

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
1642Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
20 Feb 1670AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
17 Aug 1670Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
6 Nov 1679DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Wenzel Wilhelm von Hofkirchen
Bishop Wenzel Wilhelm von Hofkirchen (died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast