Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guidobald Cardinal von Thun

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1616Born
22 Jan 164528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
3 Feb 165437.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Mar 165437.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
24 Sep 165437.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Mar 166649.2SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
7 Mar 166750.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 166750.2ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Jun 166851.4DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Guidobald von Thun (VIAF: 69705823)
Guidobald Cardinal von Thun (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfondo in Welschtirol
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Death PlaceRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Buried Place (Original)In front of Sankt Franziskus altar, Cathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017