Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Virgil von Spaur und Valör

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1609BornSpaur
21 May 163324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
16 Jan 164435.0AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
6 Mar 164435.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Jan 167061.0DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Virgil von Spaur und Valör:
Bishop Franz Virgil von Spaur und Valör (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015