Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Joseph von Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1652Born
168027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
16 Feb 169037.4AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
24 Feb 169037.5Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
20 May 170249.7DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Joseph von Thun
Bishop Rudolf Joseph von Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigo
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,777
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,820

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast