Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Caspar von Stadion

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644BornSolothurn
Oct 167329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
21 Oct 167329.8SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
31 Mar 167430.2ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 Apr 167430.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
13 Feb 170460.1DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franz Caspar von Stadion:
Bishop Franz Caspar von Stadion (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Lavant

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015