Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Anton Adolph von Wagensperg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1675Born
2 Feb 170024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
1702²26.8AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
25 Nov 170328.7Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
18 Feb 171236.9AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
25 Jul 171237.4InstalledBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
21 Aug 172348.4DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton Adolph von Wagensperg
Bishop Franz Anton Adolph von Wagensperg (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157, and Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast