Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Perneck

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1399SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Seckau, Austria
16 Sep 1399ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
4 Sep 1414DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Perneck
Bishop Friedrich von Perneck (died ) Bishop of Seckau

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast