Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Faresin, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1914BornMaragnola, Italy
9 Jun 194026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Aug 195440.2AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Registro do Araguaia, Brazil
13 Aug 195440.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
24 Oct 195440.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bubastis
14 Sep 195642.3SucceededPrelate of Registro do Araguaia, Brazil
26 May 197864.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
3 Oct 198167.4AppointedBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
20 Nov 199177.5RetiredBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Jan 200388.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Camillo Faresin:
Bishop Camillo Faresin S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guiratinga

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014