Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zerbino Lugo

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹BornBassano
2 Dec 160938.9AppointedBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece
1628¹57.0ResignedBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece
9 Jan 164069.0AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
17 Jan 164776.0DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zerbino Lugo:
Bishop Zerbino Lugo (born 1571, died ) Bishop of Feltre

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185, and Page 242
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015