Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio de Leonissa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1337AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
24 Oct 1347AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Apr 1378DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio de Leonissa
Bishop Biagio de Leonissa O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Rieti

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526, and Page 416
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast