Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio de Lucchi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1846Born
28 Jul 191164.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemesa
22 Oct 191164.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemesa
11 Apr 191366.3DiedTitular Bishop of Hemesa

MicroData Summary for Giorgio de Lucchi (VIAF: 90207840)
Bishop Giorgio de Lucchi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hemesa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiazzola sul Brenta, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained BishopVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 80
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,943

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Apr 2020

Quantcast