Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sisto Cardinal Gara della Rovere (Franciotti)

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1473Born
11 Sep 150734.6Elevated to Cardinal
11 Sep 150734.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
11 Sep 150734.6AppointedAdministrator of Lucca, Italy
11 Sep 150734.6AppointedAdministrator of Vicenza, Italy
1508²35.0AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
11 Sep 150835.6AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
11 Jun 150936.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
25 Nov 150936.8Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
27 Sep 151239.7AppointedAdministrator of Saluzzo, Italy
6 Mar 151441.1ResignedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
22 Mar 151643.2ResignedAdministrator of Saluzzo, Italy
3 Mar 151744.1ResignedAdministrator of Lucca, Italy
8 Mar 151744.1DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sisto Gara della Rovere (Franciotti)
Sisto Cardinal Gara della Rovere (Franciotti) (born 1473, died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1507
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,509, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast