Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Soderini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1453BornFlorence
11 Mar 147824.8AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
27 Mar 148632.8Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
28 Mar 148632.8Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
31 May 150350.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150350.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
6 Mar 150450.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
23 May 150552.0ResignedBishop of Cortona, Italy
27 Jan 150753.6AppointedAdministrator of Saintes, France
15 Sep 150855.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
23 May 150956.0ResignedBishop of Volterra, Italy
29 Oct 151158.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
27 Jun 151360.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
12 Jun 151461.0AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
21 Apr 151561.9AppointedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
18 Jul 151663.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
151763.6AppointedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
18 May 151763.9ResignedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
5 Mar 152369.7ResignedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
9 Dec 152370.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Dec 152370.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
14 Mar 152470.8ResignedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
17 May 152470.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Francesco Soderini:
Francesco Cardinal Soderini (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 253
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014