Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1965² | Born | ||
11 Jul 1992 | 27.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo |
1 Jan 2017 | 52.0 | Appointed | Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development |
23 Apr 2022 | 57.3 | Appointed | Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Bassano del Grappa |
Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠