Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Wall

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1582BornDillingen
160724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
28 May 161835.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 May 161835.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
15 Jul 161835.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
5 Jul 163047.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Wall:
Bishop Peter Wall (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015