Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ludwig von Schenk von Castell

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1671Born
171745.4Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
3 Jul 172553.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
26 Sep 172554.1ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Dec 172554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
17 Sep 173665.1DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Ludwig von Schenk von Castell
Bishop Franz Ludwig von Schenk von Castell (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArberg

  • a priest for 19.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast