Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kasimir Anton von Sickingen

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1684³BornEbnet
4 Nov 174359.4SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
3 Feb 174459.6ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
8 Mar 174459.7Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
30 Aug 174460.2Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
29 Aug 175066.2DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kasimir Anton von Sickingen:
Bishop Kasimir Anton von Sickingen (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 6.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013