Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Klemens von Ledebur-Wicheln

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1770BornDüsse
10 Nov 182555.0SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
3 Jul 182655.7ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Jul 182655.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 182656.0Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 Aug 184170.8DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Klemens von Ledebur-Wicheln (VIAF: 50016770)
Bishop Friedrich Klemens von Ledebur-Wicheln (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 295
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016