Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Vincenzo Forzani

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1792Born
20 May 181522.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 183947.4SelectedBishop of Susa, Italy
23 Dec 183947.4ConfirmedBishop of Susa, Italy
23 Feb 184047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
17 Oct 184351.2SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
25 Jan 184451.5ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
15 Dec 185967.4DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Vincenzo Forzani
Bishop Pio Vincenzo Forzani (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi
Ordained BishopLazaristes in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1840, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018