Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Rogers

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Ombi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1826Born
2 Jul 185124.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 186033.8AppointedBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Aug 186034.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
7 Aug 190276.0ResignedBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
26 Jan 190376.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ombi
22 Mar 190376.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Rogers
Bishop James Rogers (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chatham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMountcharles, County Donegal, Diocese of Raphoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Charlottetown, Diocese of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198, and Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017