Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick McFadden

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1947BornPhiladelphia
16 May 198133.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200457.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200457.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Horreomargum
28 Jul 200457.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horreomargum
22 Jun 201063.0AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Aug 201063.2InstalledBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 May 201365.9DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick McFadden:
Bishop Joseph Patrick McFadden (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,663
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2010
  • d: CB, 1 May 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015