Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Szilárd István Bogdánffy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1911BornFeketetó/Crna
29 Jun 193423.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 194938.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
3 Oct 195342.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
30 Oct 2010Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Szilárd István Bogdánffy:
Bishop Bl. Szilárd István Bogdánffy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,568
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013