Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfréd Eross

Deceased

Titular Bishop of the Titular See


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1909BornPrisian, Romania
27 Oct 193526.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 194939.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of the Titular See
2 Aug 195041.1DiedTitular Bishop of the Titular See

MicroData Summary for Alfréd Eross:
Bishop Alfréd Eross (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Titular See

  • a priest for 14.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/bp/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013